Accounts and annual returns CHESTER SOCIETY OF NATURAL SCIENCE, LITERATURE AND ART

Charity number: 516496
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 09 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 08 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 08 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 15 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 13 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required