INTERNATIONAL ORGANISATION FOR PEACE BUILDING AND SOCIAL JUSTICE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We conduct our efforts by advocating for peace, security, and justice and being a voice for the voiceless. We engage in community mobilisation (specifically the diasporan community and the churches in the UK) and engage the UK government and parliamentarians to support the government of our focus country to put in place measures to address the insecurity situations. We organise Social campaigns.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Nigeria
Governance
- 25 June 2021: CIO registration
- INTERNATIONAL ORGANISATION FOR PEACE BUILDING AND SOCIAL JUSTICE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OLUWAGBEMIGA BADEJO | Chair | 25 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Toluwalope Oluwafayokemi Tade | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chinwe Kalu-Uma | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ifechukwu Nnatuanya | Trustee | 25 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
OLADAPO BADEJO | Trustee | 25 June 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £206.32k | £5.36k | £17.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.68k | £171.88k | £193.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS IN NIGERIA (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS HUMAN RIGHTS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) BY MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS, RELIEVING THE NEEDS AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; AND RESEARCH AND DOCUMENTING HUMAN RIGHT ABUSES, RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS VIOLATIONS THAT OCCUR IN NIGERIA TO THE NOTICE AND ATTENTION OF FOREIGN COUNTRIES, ESPECIALLY IN THE UK. IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT OBJECT BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIES OUT ITS OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PSJUK Suite
Unit 2
Ebury Business Centre
161 - 163, Staines Road
Hounslow, Middlesex
TW3 3JZ
- Phone:
- 07737061366
- Email:
- adedoyina@psjuk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window