THE CLWYD FINE ARTS TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To encourage an appreciation of our Welsh Fine Arts Heritage by providing a collection of works of art relating to both Wales in general, and more particularly to the region of North Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Conwy
- Denbighshire
- Flintshire
- Gwynedd
- Powys
- Wrexham
Governance
- 02 October 1985: Standard registration
- 19 June 2024: Funds received from 1040969 BODELWYDDAN CASTLE TRUST
No other names
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Helen Sylvia Papworth | Trustee | 21 October 2023 |
|
|||||
DAVID VERNON BAMBER | Trustee | 05 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr KENNETH DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RHIANNON WYN HUGHES MBE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32 | £33 | £14 | £50.01k | £224.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £60 | £1.50k | £6.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 JULY 1985 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29 NOVEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT FOR THE PURPOSE OF FOSTERING AN APPRECIATION OF WELSH ART, A COLLECTION OF WORKS OF ART RELATING TO WALES AND MORE PARTICULARLY TO THE FORMER COUNTY OF CLWYD SUCH COLLECTION TO INCLUDE WORKS DEPICTING WALES OR ITS INHABITANTS OR WORKS EXECUTED BY WELSH ARTISTS EITHER IN THE PRINCIPALITY OR ELSEWHERE AND TO MAKE ALL SUCH WORKS AVAILABLE FOR VIEWING BY THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL WITH A VIEW TO ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
NORTH WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sailsbury & Co
Irish Square
Upper Denbigh Road
ST. ASAPH
Clwyd
LL17 0RN
- Phone:
- 07972003732
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window