Financial history THE DERBYSHIRE SINGERS

Charity Number: 516921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £26.94k £3.01k £5.48k £36.25k £32.51k
Total expenditure £25.63k £4.27k £17.46k £42.01k £51.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A