DEAF RAINBOW UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support, represent and inform members of the Deaf Community in the UK who are LGBT plus.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 November 2020: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tammy Grace Broskom | Chair | 16 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Paul Robert Scott | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Everett | Trustee | 12 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher D Coles | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Arran Masterman | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.66k | £26.05k | £1.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.06k | £17.16k | £11.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 February 2024 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 April 2024 | 82 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 February 2023 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 13 NOV 2020 AMENDED ON 01 DEC 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (A) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION OF DEAF LGBTIQA+ PEOPLE ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, GENDER, DISABILITY , SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR RELIGION; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; (C) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN OF LGBTIQA+ ORGANISATIONS/SECTOR OF THE NEEDS OF DEAF LGBTIQA+ PEOPLE; (D) REPRESENTING, INFORMING AND SUPPORTING DEAF PEOPLE WHO ARE LGBTIQA+ IN THE UK AS A MARGINALISED GROUP WITHIN A MINORITY (E) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY. (F) PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS, ORGANISATIONS AND CORPORATIONS FOR DEAF LGBTIQA+.
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 Albany Road
Ealing
LONDON
W13 8PQ
- Phone:
- 07871186645
- Email:
- HELLO@DEAFRAINBOWUK.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window