Financial history NORTHWICH AND DISTRICT HERITAGE SOCIETY

Charity number: 516930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.50k £345 £1.19k £1.33k £1.36k
Total expenditure £1.47k £943 £1.96k £2.64k £2.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A