Accounts and annual returns BEAM MUSIC

Charity number: 1192897
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 05 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 06 February 2025 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 19 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 19 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 20 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 20 January 2023 On Time