Financial history THE BRADFORD CHORALE

Charity number: 517197
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £7.88k £4.48k £7.95k £10.37k £9.77k
Total expenditure £8.53k £4.14k £10.78k £10.53k £9.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A