Financial history CREWE AMATEUR MUSICALS SOCIETY

Charity number: 517235
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £5.99k £0 £35.07k £37.98k £61.79k
Total expenditure £6.52k £0 £33.73k £37.02k £58.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A