Financial history THE MACHYNLLETH TABERNACLE TRUST

Charity number: 517426
Charity reporting is up to date (38 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £335.01k £352.00k £298.13k £402.62k £417.14k
Total expenditure £340.53k £251.36k £336.13k £404.79k £422.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £165.04k £35.14k £11.68k N/A