Trustees THE MACHYNLLETH TABERNACLE TRUST
Charity number: 517426

Charity reporting is up to date (38 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dennis Brace JOnes | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eirlys Stoddard | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Heledd Mair Wyn Hardy | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ELIZABETH MARSHALL | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|||||
PHILIP STEPHEN OWEN LAMBERT | Trustee | 24 October 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.