GOLDSMITHS STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1194727
Charity reporting is up to date (75 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Goldsmiths Students' Union is a democratic and charitable organisation that works independently from Goldsmiths, University of London to represent and support students. With four Full-Time Officers that help steer the union as representatives and trustees, and numerous Part-Time representative positions that help direct how the SU is organised, we aim to be as democratic and student-led as we can.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for being a trustee.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Lewisham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 June 2021: CIO registration
  • 23 November 2021: Funds received from 1151581 GOLDSMITHS STUDENTS' UNION
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • GSU (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Abigail Mensah Trustee 01 August 2024
None on record
Shada Abdalqader Trustee 13 June 2024
None on record
Nour Matar Trustee 01 August 2023
None on record
Gammorah Gibson Trustee 01 August 2023
None on record
Luca Di Mambro Moor Trustee 01 August 2023
None on record
Levante Bauer Trustee 17 March 2023
None on record
Kofi Siaw Trustee 01 February 2023
None on record
Pradeep Thatai Trustee 01 August 2021
None on record
Stephen William Spencer Norton Trustee 01 August 2020
NORTH SURREY GROUP SCOPE
Received: On time
ENHANCEABLE
Received: On time
VILLIERS PARK EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
DEAF UNITY
Received: On time
SPEAKERS' CORNER TRUST
Received: On time
ENGLISH SPEAKING BOARD (INTERNATIONAL) LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £2.24m £2.88m
Total expenditure £2.04m £3.02m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.52m £1.63m
Income - Other trading activities £401.41k £443.24k
Income - Charitable activities £320.44k £814.94k
Income - Endowments £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.63m £2.51m
Expenditure - Raising funds £413.36k £509.03k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £15.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Own use assets £25.22k £34.53k
Long-term investments £0 £0
Other assets £483.08k £451.84k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0
Total liabilities £170.33k £193.02k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 14 August 2024 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 14 August 2024 75 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 06 June 2023 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 06 June 2023 6 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
GOLDSMITHS STUDENTS' UNION
DIXON ROAD
NEW CROSS
LONDON
SE14 6NW
Phone:
02077172511