LANCASTER FOOTLIGHTS & GRAND THEATRE

Charity number: 1198714
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Lancaster Footlights is a thriving amateur drama group which is based at Lancaster Grand Theatre. They first started performing in the 1920's and purchased the Grand in 1951 to save it from demolition. Over the years the theatre has been progressively restored and it is now regularly used by many community groups and a wide range of professional acts.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 April 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Hutton Chair 09 October 2023
LANCASTER FOOTLIGHTS
Received: On time
LANCASTER FOOTLIGHTS
Received: On time
Suzanne Sutton Trustee 16 September 2024
None on record
Carina Jaine Travis Trustee 16 September 2024
None on record
Christine Williams Trustee 09 October 2023
LANCASTER FOOTLIGHTS
Received: On time
Charles Raymond Willett Trustee 09 October 2023
LANCASTER FOOTLIGHTS
Received: On time
MICHAEL THOMAS HARDY Trustee 09 October 2023
LANCASTER FOOTLIGHTS
Received: On time
David Robert Hardy Trustee 09 October 2023
LANCASTER FOOTLIGHTS
Received: On time
Adrian Paul Tayler Trustee 09 October 2023
LANCASTER FOOTLIGHTS
Received: On time
John Joseph Beamer Trustee 09 October 2023
LANCASTER FOOTLIGHTS
Received: On time
Michael William Clack Trustee 16 September 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £540.76k
Total expenditure £400 £383.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £14.39k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £402.68k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A £85
Income - Other N/A £123.61k
Income - Legacies N/A £10.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £94.52k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £288.98k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £8.75k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £330
Expenditure - Other N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets N/A £117.82k
Long-term investments N/A £0
Other assets N/A £1.27m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A £499.67k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 21 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
LANCASTER GRAND THEATRE
St Leonardgate
Lancaster
LA1 1NL
Phone:
0152464695
Website:

lancastergrand.co.uk