Financial history BRECON MOUNTAIN RESCUE TEAM

Charity number: 517732
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £86.22k £53.00k £92.07k £403.22k £198.62k
Total expenditure £70.98k £34.84k £61.19k £60.77k £68.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.32k N/A £1.31k N/A N/A