THE UK CYBER SECURITY COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Council is the self-regulatory body for the UK's cyber security profession. It develops, promotes and stewards nationally recognised standards for cyber security and the development of clear and inclusive career paths in support of the UK Government's National Cyber Security Strategy to make the UK the safest place to live and work online.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 July 2021: Standard registration
- UKCSC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claudia Natanson | Trustee | 09 May 2025 |
|
|||||
David Davis | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Edward Goodchild | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Michael Stuart Watson | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Frances Claire LeGrys | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Chitra Balakrishna | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Carla Baker | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kamalanadan Nagaiah | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.61m | £2.35m | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.54m | £2.15m | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.58m | £2.25m | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.58m | £2.25m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £28.96k | £98.25k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £500 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.51m | £1.95m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £30.82k | £198.38k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £15.14k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 AUG 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 MAY 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 AUG 2021 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 SEP 2022
Charitable objects
THE PROTECTION OF THE PUBLIC, CRITICAL NATIONAL INFRASTRUCTURE, COMMERCE, PUBLIC SECTOR AND THIRD SECTOR SERVICES AND INDIVIDUAL PERSONAL DATA FROM THE THREAT OF CYBER CRIME AND CYBER ATTACK BY THE CREATION AND MAINTENANCE OF HIGH STANDARDS AND BEST PRACTICE IN CYBER SECURITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BIRKETTS LLP
5th FLOOR
1 London Wall
LONDON
EC2Y 5BD
- Phone:
- 0204 566 6223
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window