Cefnogi

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve financial hardship for the public benefit of persons in conditions of need or hardship in Ammanford, Carmarthenshire and other parts of the United Kingdom, as the Trustees may from time to time think fit, by the provision of poverty-preventing & alleviating endeavours.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,980 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Carmarthenshire
Governance
- 14 April 2021: CIO registration
- AMMANFORD FOODBANK (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID SAMUEL DAVIES | Chair | 14 April 2021 |
|
|||||||
Ceri Bethan Darcy | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
David Mydrim Davies | Trustee | 14 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120.61k | £94.45k | £128.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.95k | £62.66k | £87.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £3.98k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Apr 2021 as amended on 29 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP IN AMMANFORD BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD THROUGH THE OPERATION OF A FOODBANK. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION7OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND)ACT2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Area of benefit
AMMANFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ammanford Evangelical Church
Y Llusern
Wind Street
AMMANFORD
Dyfed
SA18 3DR
- Phone:
- 07804189830
- Email:
- admin@cefnogi.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window