Accounts and annual returns FARNHAM LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1194104
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 09 May 2025 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 09 May 2025 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 25 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 25 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 23 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 23 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window