Trustees FARNHAM LIONS CLUB (CIO)
Charity number: 1194104

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Moran-Smith | Chair | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alyson Helen Gail Deadman | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard Keith Fellows | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Langton | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Peter Raymond Prevost | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Rory Ellis | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Edwin Richard Brown | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.