EIGHT BELLS FOR MENTAL HEALTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Eight Bells was first established in 2007 (No. 1144706). In 2021, it updated its structure and is now charity No. 1194377. Eight Bells is a friendly, member-led, voluntary group, that provides friendship, support, and a listening ear to people experiencing mental health issues in Newbury, Thatcham, and surrounding areas. We provide support for up to 100 people living across West Berkshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 07 May 2021: CIO registration
- 06 July 2023: Funds received from 1144706 EIGHT BELLS FOR MENTAL HEALTH
- 8 BELLS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Norman | Chair | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Gillespie | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marc Houston | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
VERITY MURRICANE BA, BSC | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jules Turner | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hugo Philips | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Michael Masters | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.68k | £133.00k | £76.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.83k | £94.00k | £98.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £42.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 30 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 30 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 07 May 2021
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WHOSE LIVES ARE AFFECTED BY MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES IN WEST BERKSHIRE AND THE IMMEDIATE SURROUNDING AREA (INCLUDING READING, HAMPSHIRE, OXFORDSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE) IN PARTICULAR BY: 1) PROVIDING SERVICES THAT ENHANCE MENTAL WELLBEING AND SELF-RELIANCE, SOCIAL SUPPORT, A RANGE OF SOCIAL ACTIVITIES, AND ACCESS TO TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES; 2) OPERATING A DROP IN CENTRE; (3) ASSISTING IN THE IMPLEMENTATION OF A RECOVERY FOCUSED MENTAL HEALTH SERVICE IN NEWBURY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA; AND (4) DEVELOPING A MODEL OF EFFECTIVE USER LED PARTNERSHIP WORKING TO ENABLE THESE SERVICES TO BE DELIVERED ON A LARGER SCALE, AND IN A SUSTAINABLE MANNER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BROADWAY HOUSE
4-8 THE BROADWAY
NEWBURY
RG14 1BA
- Phone:
- 07387962220
- Website:
-
eightbellsnewbury.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window