FARNDON BAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides opportunities for persons to learn or advance their playing of a brass or other instrument. Provides tuition by the running of a Junior Band and the loan of instruments. Giving public performances to assist the fund raising of other organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Denbighshire
- Flintshire
- Halton
- Wirral
- Wrexham
Governance
- 11 November 1986: Standard registration
- FARNDON AND DISTRICT BRASS BAND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY PAUL PUGH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Amy Ruth Leather | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michael Trevor-Barnston | Trustee | 16 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Joan Bellis | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROLAND STEPHEN TWYDELL | Trustee | 22 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH WINSTON BURNINGHAM | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN WAYNE | Trustee | 31 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP BUCKLEY MASON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KARI KERR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN HOWARD REEVES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.38k | £1.87k | £2.63k | £4.34k | £10.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.03k | £2.03k | £4.38k | £5.30k | £7.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/03/1985 AS AMENDED ON 22/05/1986 AS AMENDED ON 29/09/1994 AS AMENDED ON 09/10/2003 AS AMENDED ON 13/05/2004 AS AMENDED ON 19/05/2011 AS AMENDED ON 17/05/2012
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE MUSICAL ARTS AND PRIMARILY THE ART OF BRASS BAND PLAYING, TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND SIMILAR ACTIVITIES, AND, SUBJECT TO THE AGREEMENT OF THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE, TO ASSIST OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 Inveresk Road
Tilston
MALPAS
SY14 7ED
- Phone:
- 01244383174
- Email:
- info@farndonband.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window