Financial history AGE CONCERN BLACKPOOL AND DISTRICT

Charity number: 518015
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £865.52k £877.58k £748.43k £728.02k £0
Total expenditure £819.10k £927.74k £813.86k £789.84k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £10.46k £13.89k £15.94k £10.63k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £202.33k £219.48k £259.56k £229.38k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £591.12k £580.47k £403.10k £424.17k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £1.06k £1.97k £820 £518 N/A
Income - Other £60.56k £61.78k £69.02k £63.33k N/A
Income - Legacies £7.07k £2.00k £0 £1.42k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £658.18k £785.91k £672.51k £636.75k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £67.81k £9.84k £6.82k £4.80k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £39.33k £41.29k £41.59k N/A