LOVE BURLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Aiding aging people in our community through social events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
Governance
- 08 October 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Sally Hayes | Chair | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robert Felstead | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Wriglesworth | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Norah Kershaw | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robert Saville | Trustee | 08 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.00k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.02k | £756 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 February 2025 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 May 2025 | 189 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 July 2024 | 252 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 July 2024 | 252 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT[S] OF THE CIO [IS][ARE] FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT INCLUDING, BUT LIMITED TO, PROVIDING SOCIAL ACTIVITIES AND/OR SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008]
Contact information
- Address:
-
2A Greenhow Park
Burley in Wharfedale
ILKLEY
LS29 7LZ
- Phone:
- 07802800016
- Email:
- ROBERT.SAVILLE@HOTMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window