Financial history MERSEYSIDE AND DISTRICT MISSIONARY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 518120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £20.46k £28.61k £28.09k £22.37k £21.80k
Total expenditure £57.47k £41.64k £96.18k £51.13k £42.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A