KNARESBOROUGH FRIENDSHIP AND LEISURE CENTRE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity operates from Frazer House 23 Market Place Knaresborough we are a meeting room mainly for the elderly to visit whilst out shopping to drop in for a cup of tea/coffee etc and a biscuit to sit and chat and read the daily papers run entirely by volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 18 October 2021: CIO registration
- 26 April 2022: Funds received from 213110 KNARESBOROUGH OLD PEOPLES WELFARE ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Moore | Chair | 27 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Gillian Mercer | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aleli Richmond | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.39k | £18.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.18k | £14.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF ELDERLY PEOPLE, AND THOSE PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM THE EFFECTS OF PREMATURE AGEING, RESIDING IN NORTH YORKSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF ACTIVITIES, SERVICES OR FACILITIES DESIGNED TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 MARKET PLACE
KNARESBOROUGH
HG5 8AL
- Phone:
- 07964469837
- Email:
- fandlcentre@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window