THE PAY IT FORWARD VOUCHER SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing evouchers to supporting organisations and the person in need so the person in need can buy food, groceries, toiletries, non-alcoholic drink, clothing . All evouchers are tracked. They can't be exchanged for alcohol or tobabcco.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 22 June 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 19 November 2021: CIO registration
- PAY IT FORWARD VOUCHER SCHEME (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Theresa M Feetenby | Chair | 13 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rob Steadman | Trustee | 08 September 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 22/06/2022 | 22/06/2023 | 22/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.75k | £2.13k | £2.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £806 | £2.00k | £1.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 22 June 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 June 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 22 June 2023 | 18 June 2024 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 June 2023 | 18 June 2024 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 22 June 2022 | 02 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 June 2022 | 02 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN ENGLAND BY PROVIDING A PAY IT FORWARD VOUCHER SCHEME TO ENABLE THOSE WHO ARE IN FINANCIAL NEED TO BUY FOOD, CLOTHES, TOILETRIES, OR OTHER ESSENTIAL ITEMS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
229 THE SYCAMORES
MILTON
CAMBRIDGE
CB24 6ZD
- Phone:
- 07895199028
- Email:
- pifvouchers@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window