UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE LEEDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
U3A Leeds is devoted to lifelong learning, providing opportunities for those in the Leeds area no longer in full time employment to share skills and interests by learning together. We hold fortnightly general meetings, usually with a speaker, and have special interest groups where members can share their knowledge, skills, and experiences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leeds City
Governance
- 12 January 1987: Standard registration
- U 3 A (Working name)
- UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (LEEDS BRANCH) (Previous name)
- UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE LEEDS (U3A LEEDS) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Karen Frood | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Higginbotham | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Andrew Thurston | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Anne Greenland | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Janet Christine Powell | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
MAX EDWARD RICHARD DUDLEY | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gary Alan Thurston | Trustee | 16 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Karen Turner | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.75k | £6.41k | £16.20k | £29.31k | £33.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.76k | £6.22k | £18.93k | £27.60k | £29.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 JUL 1986 AS AMENDED ON 21 JAN 2003 AS AMENDED ON 22 FEB 2005 AS AMENDED ON 14 FEB 2006 AS AMENDED ON 08 MAR 2011 AS AMENDED ON 08 MAR 2012 AS AMENDED ON 22 MAY 2018 AS AMENDED ON 29 SEP 2020 as amended on 20 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
The charity’s object is the advancement of education, and, in particular, the education of older people and those who are retired from full-time work, by all means, including associated activities conducive to learning and personal development in Leeds and the surrounding areas.
Area of benefit
LEEDS AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
MOORALLERTON SPORTS & SOCIAL CENTRE
STONEGATE ROAD
LEEDS
LS17 6EL
- Phone:
- 07951455020
- Email:
- secretary@u3aleeds.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window