THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NEOTS WITH EYNESBURY

Charity number: 1195248
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religion - the Church of England parish covering the greater part of the town of St Neots that lies east of the River Great Ouse.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £128,616
Total expenditure: £149,442

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 July 2021: Standard registration
  • 19 September 2024: Funds received from 204938 ST NEOTS BELL ROPE CHARITY
  • 20 September 2024: Funds received from 206540 CHATTERIS CHARITY
  • 20 September 2024: Funds received from 206542 SMITHS CHARITY
  • 20 September 2024: Funds received from 206537 REVEREND JOHN GREEN TRUST
  • 20 September 2024: Funds received from 206539 EMILY ANNE DAY TRUST
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST NEOTS WITH EYNESBURY PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Andrew Paul Hutchinson Chair 01 March 2020
THE WORKHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
WYE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
WILLIAM MEDLAND'S CHARITY
Received: On time
JOSEPH EAYRE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN HOLLANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN DRYDEN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
EMMA J HIDE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
JOAN CROMWELLS CHARITY
Received: On time
C P ROWLEY CHARITIES
Received: On time
WILLIAM LUFF ANDERSON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
MUSGRAVE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Marion Ann Catmull Trustee 28 April 2024
C P ROWLEY CHARITIES
Received: On time
JOHN DRYDEN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
EMMA J HIDE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
JOSEPH EAYRE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
WILLIAM MEDLAND'S CHARITY
Received: On time
MUSGRAVE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE WORKHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
WYE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN HOLLANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
JOAN CROMWELLS CHARITY
Received: On time
WILLIAM LUFF ANDERSON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
David John Wells Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Stephen Gill Trustee 03 April 2022
OUSE VALLEY CHORUS
Received: On time
Dr Gabriel Senyo Amable Trustee 03 April 2022
None on record
Godfrey Gordon Wilson Trustee 03 April 2022
None on record
Andrew William Isaac Trustee 12 May 2021
None on record
Tara Celeste Skey Trustee 12 May 2021
None on record
Angela Joyce Robertson Trustee 12 May 2021
None on record
Christine Miles Trustee 01 March 2020
MUSGRAVE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
WILLIAM LUFF ANDERSON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE WORKHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
WYE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
WILLIAM MEDLAND'S CHARITY
Received: On time
JOSEPH EAYRE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN HOLLANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN DRYDEN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
EMMA J HIDE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
JOAN CROMWELLS CHARITY
Received: On time
C P ROWLEY CHARITIES
Received: On time
Anthony Phillip Hopwood Trustee 01 March 2020
MUSGRAVE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
WILLIAM LUFF ANDERSON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE WORKHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
WYE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
WILLIAM MEDLAND'S CHARITY
Received: On time
JOSEPH EAYRE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN HOLLANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN DRYDEN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
EMMA J HIDE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
JOAN CROMWELLS CHARITY
Received: On time
C P ROWLEY CHARITIES
Received: On time
CAROL PATRICIA WAY Trustee 01 March 2020
None on record
Peter Rufus Raggatt Trustee 01 March 2020
THE FRIENDS OF ST NEOTS PARISH CHURCH
Received: On time
Catherina Elizabeth Griffiths Trustee 01 March 2020
None on record
David Frank Read Trustee 01 March 2020
None on record
VALERIE ANN FREEMAN Trustee 01 March 2020
None on record
PHILIP RICHARD BARRETT Trustee 01 March 2020
NEWTON'S AND HATLEY'S SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
JACQUELYN MARY ISAAC Trustee 01 March 2020
None on record
Christian Robb Laughton Trustee 01 March 2020
None on record
Helen Bloxham Trustee 01 March 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £133.84k £128.62k
Total expenditure £120.65k £149.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 05 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 05 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 21 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 21 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE PARISH OFFICE
CHURCH STREET
ST. NEOTS
PE19 2BU
Phone:
01480370312