NOTTINGHAM PLAY FORUM LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operation of a Scrap Store, Equipment Hire, Art Shop, Admin Resources, Play Development, Training, Play Forum Activities, Street Play Provision, Creche, Events, Development Support to Groups, Community Engagement/Involvement, Network Development and Support, Community Research, Volunteering
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 27 July 1987: Standard registration
- 01 March 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- PLAYWORKS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £165.80k | £213.61k | £221.58k | £178.05k | £199.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £199.71k | £213.47k | £196.28k | £149.69k | £190.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £6.10k | £12.15k | £5.95k | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £5.00k | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 NOVEMBER 1986
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAY AND RECREATION FOR CHILDREN IN NOTTINGHAM BEING FACILITIES WHICH: (A) SUCH CHILDREN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR AGE OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. (B) WILL IMPROVE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH CHILDREN BY PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATIONAL PHYSICAL MENTAL OR SPIRITUAL WELL BEING.
Area of benefit
NOTTINGHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window