Financial history THE RIVER WYE PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 518555
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £1.76k £1.67k £1.52k £1.40k £1.26k
Total expenditure £2.49k £1.42k £930 £1.31k £1.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A