Trustees THE DODS
Charity Number: 1195584

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FRANCES MARJORIE TELFORD | Chair | 22 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
William George Irvine | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Bussey | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Maxwell Robinson | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Craig John Hewlett | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Hitchings | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Richard Raymond Telford | Trustee | 02 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Smallridge | Trustee | 02 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Ann Hamilton | Trustee | 02 December 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.