Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S, SUMMERSTOWN
Charity number: 1202536

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev James John Gareth Fletcher | Chair | 05 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Giulia Kengne Fotso | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Priscilla Henebeng | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ranjit Solomon Premraj | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Smith | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Okonkwo | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jolly Sirikwa | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hezekiah Aaron Walters | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eustace Jeffrey | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Brown | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Mark Myers | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon John Baigent | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Crystal Joy Baigent | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Barker | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.