THEATRE SPACE NORTH EAST CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Dramatic Arts for the public benefit through the provision of accessible live performance, including, but not limited to: Theatre, Plays, Mime, Movement, Dance, Music, Storytelling and Puppetry. Furthermore, to advance the education of the public in the arts by the provision of theatre-in-education, accessible Drama and Arts education, teaching, mentorship and all ancillary activity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 11 April 2022: CIO registration
- THEATRE SPACE NORTH EAST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Posy Jowett | Chair | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas James Kelly | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Whiteoak | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mavis Cathrine Whiteoak | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 February 2024 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 February 2024 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE DRAMATIC ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ACCESSIBLE LIVE PERFORMANCE, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO: THEATRE, PLAYS, READING, MIME AND MOVEMENT, DANCE, MUSIC, STORY-TELLING AND PUPPETRY. FURTHERMORE, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS BY THE PROVISION OF THEATRE-IN-EDUCATION AND ACCESSIBLE DRAMA AND ARTS EDUCATION; TEACHING AND MENTORSHIP AND ALL ANCILLARY ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Collective Space
14a Borough Road
Sunderland
SR1 1EP
- Phone:
- 07960838434
- Email:
- hello@theatrespace.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window