SANSKRIT TEXT SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The STS works to advance the education of the public in Oxford and across the UK and South Asia on the historic, cultural, and intellectual traditions of the Hindus, Buddhists, and Jains from Asia, particularly but not exclusively, literary and intellectual works composed in Sanskrit and related languages and to support students and scholars working on them in the UK and South Asia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Hong Kong
- India
- Nepal
Governance
- 15 March 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anupam Kumar Suman | Trustee | 15 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR DIWAKAR NATH ACHARYA | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr BIHANI SARKAR | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
DR JOHN LOWE | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr GILLIAN EVISON | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 January 2025 | 447 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 January 2025 | 447 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE STS IS BEING SET UP TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN OXFORD AND ACROSS THE UK AND SOUTH ASIA ON THE HISTORIC, CULTURAL, AND INTELLECTUAL TRADITIONS OF THE HINDUS, BUDDHISTS, AND JAINS FROM ASIA, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, LITERARY AND INTELLECTUAL WORKS COMPOSED IN SANSKRIT LANGUAGE AND TO SUPPORT STUDENTS AND SCHOLARS WORKING ON SANSKRIT TEXTS IN THE UK AND SOUTH ASIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
85 Banbury Road
KIDLINGTON
OX5 1AH
- Phone:
- 01865848701
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window