THE HANDY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO HELP ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF AND PROVIDE COUNSELLING TO YOUNG PERSONS IN THE PARISH OF HYTHE, DIBDEN AND MARCHWOOD, HAMPSHIRE SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS RESPONSIBLE MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £44,656 from 2 government contract(s) and £7,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TREVOR DOUGLAS HANMORE | Chair | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Dowd | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Timothy Parsons | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Franklain Pyne | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Pyne | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sean Cullen | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|||||
John Frederick Case | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Malcolm Spencer WADE | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £194.78k | £116.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.71k | £120.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £24.81k | £44.66k | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.57k | £7.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO HELP ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF AND PROVIDE COUNSELLING TO YOUNG PERSONS IN THE PARISH OF HYTHE, DIBDEN AND MARCHWOOD, HAMPSHIRE SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS RESPONSIBLE MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE GROVE
25 ST. JOHN STREET
HYTHE
The Grove
25 St John's Street
Hythe
- Phone:
- 02382544049
- Email:
- info@thehandytrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window