ORPHAN APPEAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poverty and hardship among orphans and vulnerable children anywhere in the world by providing financial support, education, healthcare, clothes, house building, other urgent needs and other such charitable services as the trustees may from time to time think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2023
Total income includes £2,305 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Algeria
- Bangladesh
- Pakistan
- Syria
- Turkey
- Yemen
Governance
- 23 December 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRAHIM ZAIDI | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dana Mohamed Rasol | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Noureddine Guendouz | Trustee | 12 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr ABDULRAHMAN MESSAOUD ZAIDI | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Ismail Zaidi | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bou-Baker Hachemi-Rachedi | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rasheda ZAHER-DRAEY | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.31k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 135 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 135 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 30 July 2024 | 215 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 30 July 2024 | 215 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OF ORPHANS AND VULNERABLE CHILDREN ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 UPPER DARTREY WALK
WORLD'S END ESTATE
LONDON
SW10 0EN
- Phone:
- 07578310672
- Email:
- info@orphan-appeal.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window