Trustees CATALYST SCIENCE DISCOVERY CENTRE AND MUSEUM TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 518850

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HUGH GORDON DOWDING | Chair | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Hughes | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
KEVAN PETER WAINWRIGHT | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
JAY MARK WIEGAND | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Wilson Hart | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
NOEL HUTCHINSON | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|||||
MELISSA MARY LORD | Trustee | 07 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr DONALD WESTWOOD | Trustee | 31 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Davies | Trustee | 25 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr DIANA LEITCH | Trustee | 05 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD HOPWOOD | Trustee | 04 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr MICHAEL ROBERT PITTS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.