Accounts and annual returns DIAL HOUSE CHESTER

Charity number: 518908
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2013 01 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 01 October 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 17 September 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 17 September 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 27 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 27 September 2011 On Time