Financial history DIAL HOUSE CHESTER

Charity number: 518908
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £277.37k £323.82k £341.48k £302.11k £282.94k
Total expenditure £256.78k £283.92k £319.69k £305.43k £308.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A