HATFIELD WOODHOUSE VILLAGE HALL AND OLD FOLKS CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintaining a building in order to provide modern and safe facilities for organisations, groups and private individuals. Users range from individuals with a particular interest/hobby to the area WI, DMBC, Cycling Club Meets. Hatfield Woodhouse Village Hall offers social, educational and entertainment activities for the general public resident in and around the area of Hatfield Woodhouse.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £15,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Doncaster
Governance
- 08 March 1988: Standard registration
- HATFIELD WOODHOUSE VILLAGE HALL AND OLD PEOPLES CEN (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jamie Love | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anushka Price | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Edwin Allen | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
susan convery | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Allen | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Russell Leese | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bronia Minshaw | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Greenwood | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Hesketh | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Mary Weeks | Trustee | 15 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BROWN | Trustee |
|
||||||
COLIN HEPWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr IAN ROBERT WEEKS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.57k | £45.67k | £30.92k | £35.39k | £53.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.74k | £50.24k | £19.98k | £36.83k | £29.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £26.50k | £26.14k | £6.02k | £15.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 08 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 08 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST INSTRUMENT DATED 15 OCTOBER 1970
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF HATFIELD WOODHOUSE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES, CLASSES AND OLD FOLKS' CENTRE AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
HATFIELD WOODHOUSE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAWTHORNS
CHURCHILL AVENUE
HATFIELD
DONCASTER
DN7 6LU
- Phone:
- 01302350570
- Email:
- Hatfielddoc@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window