Financial history NORTH WEST CANCER RESEARCH (INCORPORATING CLATTERBRIDGE CANCER RESEARCH CCR)

Charity number: 519357
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £1.54m £2.05m £4.90m £2.90m £2.84m
Total expenditure £2.18m £2.11m £3.03m £3.30m £4.18m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £51.37k N/A £365.06k £772.44k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.33m £1.79m £4.64m £2.62m £2.41m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £110.19k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £211.55k £261.50k £256.44k £280.13k £315.94k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £778.37k £1.16m £3.64m £945.45k £644.02k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.63m £1.53m £2.41m £2.54m £3.22m
Expenditure - Raising funds £542.74k £588.40k £617.10k £760.30k £953.23k
Expenditure - Governance £120.43k £93.95k £150.33k £150.43k £149.01k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.34m £1.24m £2.00m £1.96m £2.61m
Expenditure - Investment management £33.71k £34.48k £31.38k £29.64k £31.31k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0