Trustees NORTH WEST CANCER RESEARCH (INCORPORATING CLATTERBRIDGE CANCER RESEARCH CCR)
Charity number: 519357

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CATHERINE MARY JONES | Chair | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Giles | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Jenny Bowers | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Julie Edler | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Keri Barton | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Louise Clague | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Stalker | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Willis | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Edmund Moonan | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Frances Hewison | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandeep Anantharaman | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sharvari Kothari-Short | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael FitzGerald Carter | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.