PARCLLYN COMMUNITY SPORTS & LEISURE FIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and develop the community field in the village of Parcllyn. To encourage all residents of the Aberporth Ward and further afield to participate in sporting activities and events, with no discrimination to age, ability or origin. To improve the wellbeing, mental health, physical health and social aspects of the ward. To arrange Events to encourage community participation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 08 June 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Damon Derek Watmough | Chair | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dylan Tom Jones | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
LIAM DANIELS | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
ZOE MICHELLE STORER | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Francesca Louise Narbett | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £833 | £795 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 12 July 2024 | 157 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | 31 August 2024 | 207 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF PARCLLYN AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 PENNAR ROAD
PARCLLYN
ABERTEIFI
SA43 2DG
- Phone:
- 07967296766
- Email:
- zoestorer@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window