ST PADARNS PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide pre school education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £12,053 from 2 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Ceredigion
Governance
- 14 February 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marie Nicole Pugh-Jenkins | Chair | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rhian Lynn Pugh | Trustee | 09 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ceri Carter | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jade Aydogmus | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michaela Richards | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Erik Haxell | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tarnia May Miller | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Enid Teresa Brophy | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Rowe | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Sandra Beckett | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kari Greengross | Trustee | 26 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.92k | £111.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.51k | £94.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.05k | £12.05k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 December 2024 | 170 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 December 2024 | 170 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 April 2024 | 296 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 21 April 2024 | 296 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN WALES, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THEIR NEEDS THROUGH HIGH QUALITY CHILDCARE PROVISION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Padarn's Playgroup
LLANBADARN ROAD
ABERYSTWYTH
SY23 1EZ
- Phone:
- 01970623289
- Email:
- hello@stpadarns.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window