FRIENDS OF THE DALES COUNTRYSIDE MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Promotion of the improvement of the Dales Countryside Museum. 2. Raising of funds to help in maintaining and enlarging the collection. 3. Arranging lectures and other interesting and educational events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 10 December 1987: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF THE UPPER DALES FOLK MUSEUM (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Iain Martin Garside | Chair | 18 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Stephanie Anne Hamilton Durrant | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Shelagh Hunter | Trustee | 16 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Val Davis | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Sally Stone | Trustee | 20 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Ms Pip Land | Trustee | 16 October 2015 |
|
|||||||
AUDREY MILLER THWAITE | Trustee | 29 December 2011 |
|
|
||||||
ELEANOR MARY SCARR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
SUSAN FOSTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
AUDREY THORNBORROW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MARILYN ZENA CRUICKSHANKS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JANE MACINTOSH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
GRAEME PHILIP THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
GEOFF KEEBLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.08k | £8.56k | £6.69k | £4.36k | £10.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.89k | £2.79k | £869 | £9.64k | £14.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 17 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 OCTOBER 1987 AS AMENDED 19 OCTOBER 1990
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENTS OF THE DALES COUNTRYSIDE MUSEUM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
JAYS COTTAGE
SEDBUSK
HAWES
DL8 3PU
- Phone:
- 01969667060
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window