Financial history THE MANCHESTER CAMERATA TRUST

Charity number: 519574
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10 £5 £5 £5 £0
Total expenditure £120 £120 £630 £600 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A