THE BATHURST CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of Almshouse accommodation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tina Knight | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Rev Lynda Sebbage | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Graham Sando | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roger Forster | Trustee | 15 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE GRIFFIN | Trustee | 15 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES MURPHY | Trustee | 15 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
John LeFever | Trustee | 15 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND INCLUDE THE FOLLOWING: (A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR HARDSHIP BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSE ACCOMMODATION; AND (B) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF RESIDENTS OF THE ALMSHOUSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO CURRENT RESIDENTS WHO ARE IN NEED. RESIDENTS OF THE ALMSHOUSES SHALL BE PERSONS OF 50 YEARS OF AGE OR MORE WHO, PRIOR TO THEIR APPOINTMENT, ARE RESIDENT IN OR CAN DEMONSTRATE A STRONG CONNECTION WITH THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND ARE IN SUFFICIENT NEED OR HARDSHIP WHICH REQUIRES SUPPORT. IN THIS CONSTITUTION, THE EXPRESSION 'AREA OF BENEFIT' SHALL MEAN THE PARISHES OF DEBDEN AND WIMBISH, NEAR SAFFRON WALDON IN ESSEX. IF, AFTER THREE MONTHS OF ADVERTISING A VACANCY, THE CHARITY TRUSTEES HAVE BEEN UNABLE TO IDENTIFY A SUITABLE CANDIDATE TO BE A BENEFICIARY AND RESIDENT, THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY, FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE VACANCY IN QUESTION, AND AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION, DISREGARD THE 50 YEARS OF AGE OR MORE RESTRICTION AND/OR EXTEND THE AREA OF BENEFIT TO SURROUNDING PARISHES. RESIDENTS WILL BE REQUESTED TO MAKE A REASONABLE FINANCIAL CONTRIBUTION, BASED ON THEIR INDIVIDUAL MEANS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Barltrops
High Street
Debden
SAFFRON WALDEN
CB11 3LE
- Phone:
- 01799542717
- Email:
- arthur.davey@btopenworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window