Financial history BELAN OLD SCHOOL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 519839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £1.67k £53 £1.84k £1.84k £4.37k
Total expenditure £2.56k £1.16k £4.10k £4.10k £4.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A