NINE LIVES POETRY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the CIO is to promote the arts for the public benefit in particular the art of poetry and to advance public education and appreciation of the art of poetry howsoever and wheresoever and particularly in the county of South Yorkshire in all respects for the public benefit. The CIO will do this by providing a regular poetry event and/or educational poetry workshops.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnsley
- Doncaster
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 16 June 2022: CIO registration
- 23 April 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
- 23 April 2024: Funds transferred to 306694 THE ARVON FOUNDATION
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PROMOTE THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR THE ART OF POETRY AND TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART OF POETRY HOWSOEVER AND WHERESOEVER AND PARTICULARLY IN THE COUNTY OF SOUTH YORKSHIRE IN ALL RESPECTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. THE CIO WILL DO THIS BY PROVIDING A REGULAR POETRY EVENT AND/OR EDUCATIONAL POETRY WORKSHOPS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window