TIVERTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide and maintain a village hall for the use of the inhabitants of Tiverton and neighbourhood.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 05 December 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Kenneth Morris | Chair | 09 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Kaufman | Trustee | 09 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Colin Huntington | Trustee | 09 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Edge | Trustee | 09 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Diana Carr | Trustee | 09 January 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.52k | £16.68k | £1.78k | £1.97k | £3.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.03k | £1.16k | £2.38k | £3.89k | £4.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £16.34k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 06 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 14 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8TH FEBRUARY 1960
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
TIVERTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tiverton Village Hall
Huxley Lane
Tiverton
CW6 9NB
- Phone:
- 01829309338
- Email:
- ken_morris751@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window