Financial history BRAMHALL GIRL GUIDES

Charity number: 520207
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £18.65k £7.61k £8.48k £8.35k £8.63k
Total expenditure £10.39k £6.90k £12.15k £9.06k £11.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A